Date/Name Ship |
1867-00-00 BERNARD |
Manager: |
F.W. Meyer, Papenburg, North German Confederation (18.08.1866-16.04.1871) |
Eigenaar: |
F.W. Meyer, Papenburg, North German Confederation (18.08.1866-16.04.1871) |
Shareholder: |
|
Homeport / Flag: |
Papenburg / North German Confederation (18.08.1866-16.04.1871) |
Date/Name Ship |
1892-01-21 BERNARD |
Manager: |
P. Meursing, Groningen, Groningen, Netherlands |
Eigenaar: |
P. Meursing, Groningen, Groningen, Netherlands |
Shareholder: |
|
Homeport / Flag: |
Groningen / Netherlands |
Additional info: |
1e Nederl. zeebrief 21 januari 1892, gezonden naar Nederl. consul te Bremen |
Date/Name Ship |
1892-06-04 ELINA |
Manager: |
F. Manning, Groningen, Groningen, Netherlands |
Eigenaar: |
F. Manning, Groningen, Groningen, Netherlands |
Shareholder: |
|
Homeport / Flag: |
Groningen / Netherlands |
Additional info: |
Nederl. zeebrief 4 juni 1892 |
Date/Name Ship |
1897-08-06 WILHELM |
Manager: |
|
Eigenaar: |
|
Shareholder: |
|
Homeport / Flag: |
Onbekend / Onbekend |
Date/Name Ship |
1901-01-17 WILHELM |
Manager: |
|
Eigenaar: |
|
Shareholder: |
|
Homeport / Flag: |
Onbekend / Onbekend |
|